WA SB5131 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding certain public facilities eligible to be credited against the imposition of impact fees.
Title
Expanding certain public facilities eligible to be credited against the imposition of impact fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Scott White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-03-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-03 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-01-25 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-01-14 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |