WA SB5127 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amending provisions governing structured settlements by removing age barriers and clarifying legislative intent.
Title
Amending provisions governing structured settlements by removing age barriers and clarifying legislative intent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-06-11 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-06-11 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development |
2013-06-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2013-06-08 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Notice to reconsider withdrawn. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Notice given to reconsider vote on third reading. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Third reading. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Held on second reading. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1097 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.