WA SB5121 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the effect of zoning ordinances on hobby vehicle restoration. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning the restoration of collector vehicles. )
Title
Concerning the effect of zoning ordinances on hobby vehicle restoration. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning the restoration of collector vehicles. )
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Carrell [R] | Sen. Donald Benton [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] |
Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-22 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations . |