WA SB5119 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the state auditor to receive nonconviction data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the state auditor to receive nonconviction data.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-01-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2022-12-30SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1179 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-06 - Effective date 7/23/2023.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1097050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101460Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback