WA SB5119 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning individuals in custody.
Title
Concerning individuals in custody.
Sponsors
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 139, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-18 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-27 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 06c | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 48 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
72 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |