WA SB5119 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Including highway workers employed on a transportation project by a contractor in the tuition and fee exemption for children and surviving spouses of highway workers.
Title
Including highway workers employed on a transportation project by a contractor in the tuition and fee exemption for children and surviving spouses of highway workers.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 144, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 78; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-27 | House | CWD - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |