WA SB5113 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the department of commerce to coordinate and advance the siting and manufacturing of small modular reactors in the state to meet future energy supply, environmental, and energy security needs.
Title
Requiring the department of commerce to coordinate and advance the siting and manufacturing of small modular reactors in the state to meet future energy supply, environmental, and energy security needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-07-10 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-07-02 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-03 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-04-01 | House | TED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | EET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |