WA SB5089 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing early learning access for children ages thirty months and older with developmental delays or disabilities.
Title
Increasing early learning access for children ages thirty months and older with developmental delays or disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019**. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 409, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-06 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-22 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |