WA SB5081 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing transparency of state government expenditures related to state employees, state vendors and other public entities.
Title
Increasing transparency of state government expenditures related to state employees, state vendors and other public entities.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] | Sen. Andy Hill [R] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] |
Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2015-04-23 | House | House insists on its position and asks Senate to concur. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2015-04-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill. |
2015-04-15 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2015-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-04-01 | House | SG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |