WA SB5077 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing authority to licensed companies to allow licensed mortgage loan originators to work from their residences without the company licensing the residence as a branch office of the company.
Title
Providing authority to licensed companies to allow licensed mortgage loan originators to work from their residences without the company licensing the residence as a branch office of the company.
Sponsors
Sen. Perry Dozier [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Mona Das [D] |
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Chapter 15, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-03-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-03-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-12 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-11 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | BFST - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 146 | 0201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 146 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 04 | 027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 04 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |