WA SB5071 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021***.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021***.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating transition teams to assist specified persons under civil commitment.
Title
Creating transition teams to assist specified persons under civil commitment.
Sponsors
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Civil Rights & Judiciary (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Civil Rights & Judiciary (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021***. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 263, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-11 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-26 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-03 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | BH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 77 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 02 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 02 | 240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 05 | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 05 | 585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 24 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |