WA SB5062 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing wildlife viewing opportunities.
Title
Enhancing wildlife viewing opportunities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-13 | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-13 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-13 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-13 | NROR - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-12 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-05 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. | |
2009-01-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5062&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5062.pdf |