WA SB5059 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning protecting state and federal monuments, memorials, and statues from damage intentionally inflicted during the course of unpeaceful demonstrations or riots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning protecting state and federal monuments, memorials, and statues from damage intentionally inflicted during the course of unpeaceful demonstrations or riots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-01-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-01-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-28SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2021-01-05SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9a48110Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5059&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5059.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5059-S.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5059%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5059%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5059%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123150&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28351&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback