WA SB5059 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the crime of rendering criminal assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the crime of rendering criminal assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-03SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2014-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-05-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2013-04-17HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-04-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2013-04-03HousePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-04-03HousePS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2013-04-03HousePS - Executive action taken by committee.
2013-04-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2013-03-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2013-03-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety
2013-03-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2013-03-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2013-03-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2013-02-27SenateMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2013-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-02-08SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2013-02-08SenateMinority; do not pass.
2013-02-08SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2013-02-08SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2013-02-04SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
2013-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
2013-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice .

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback