WA SB5034 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning local government financial reports.
Title
Concerning local government financial reports.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-22 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 3; excused, 1. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |