WA SB5015 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning unlawful detainer actions for at-will tenancies.
Title
Concerning unlawful detainer actions for at-will tenancies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | FI - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5015&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5015.pdf |