WA SB5012 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the growing of industrial hemp.
Title
Authorizing the growing of industrial hemp.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Douglas Ericksen [R] |
Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-03-23 | House | COG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | AWRD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development. |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |