WA SB5006 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the termination of all legal responsibilities of a nonparent if genetic testing shows by clear and convincing evidence that a man is not the genetic father of a child.
Title
Authorizing the termination of all legal responsibilities of a nonparent if genetic testing shows by clear and convincing evidence that a man is not the genetic father of a child.
Sponsors
Sen. Jan Angel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:45 PM. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1524 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.