WA SB5005 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a program to certify and market certain cattle from Washington as either "natural beef cattle" or "natural grass-fed beef cattle."
Title
Creating a program to certify and market certain cattle from Washington as either "natural beef cattle" or "natural grass-fed beef cattle."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-17 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-10 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-03 | APPG - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-04-03 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-03 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2009-03-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-27 | AGNR - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-27 | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. | |
2009-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | ARED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Rural Economic Development. | |
2009-12-04 | Prefiled for introduction. |