WA SB5000 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning online access to health care resources for veterinarians and veterinary technicians.
Title
Concerning online access to health care resources for veterinarians and veterinary technicians.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 140, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-20 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:30 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1555 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.