WA HJR4220 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the state Constitution so that the provision relating to bailable crimes by sufficient sureties is modified.
Title
Amending the state Constitution so that the provision relating to bailable crimes by sufficient sureties is modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-08 | Passed final passage; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-08 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-04 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-04 | Committee amendment not adopted. | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | JUD - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-26 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-09 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-02-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-01-26 | Placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-22 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-22 | PSEP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-22 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-18 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR8224 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.