WA HJR4207 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that all mandatory, regulatory, licensing, and disciplinary functions regarding the practice of law and administration of justice reside exclusively in the supreme court.
Title
Requiring that all mandatory, regulatory, licensing, and disciplinary functions regarding the practice of law and administration of justice reside exclusively in the supreme court.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Scott [R] |
Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. Graham Hunt [R] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=4207&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Joint Resolutions/4207.pdf |