WA HJM4005 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-9)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting assistance to minimize the impacts of recent changes in port operations on Washington's agriculture, food, and timber industries.
Title
Requesting assistance to minimize the impacts of recent changes in port operations on Washington's agriculture, food, and timber industries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-03 | House | First reading, referred to Labor |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=4005&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Joint Memorials/4005-Ports-ag, food, timber.pdf |