WA HCR4416 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Approving specific statewide educational attainment goals.
Title
Approving specific statewide educational attainment goals.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] |
Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House vote on Adoption (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
2014-03-06 | House | Third reading, adopted; yeas, 69; nays, 27; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |