WA HCR4403 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Calling a Joint Session of the Legislature for the State of the State Address.
Title
Calling a Joint Session of the Legislature for the State of the State Address.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Sullivan [D] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-01-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Third reading, adopted. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2020-01-13 | House | Third reading, adopted. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading. |
2019-12-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |