WA HCR4402 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-01-15 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-01-15 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing cutoff dates.
Title
Establishing cutoff dates.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Kessler [D] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-15 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2009-01-15 | President signed. | |
2009-01-14 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-01-12 | Third reading, adopted. | |
2009-01-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-01-12 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2009-01-12 | Third reading, adopted. | |
2009-01-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-01-12 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2009-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |