WA HB3193 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-02 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-02 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting salary bonuses associated with the national board for professional teaching standards.
Title
Adjusting salary bonuses associated with the national board for professional teaching standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-02 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-15 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-09 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-09 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-03-09 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-03-09 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 12:00 PM. | |
2010-03-08 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-28 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=3193&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/3193.pdf |