WA HB3178 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating efficiencies in the use of technology in state government.
Title
Creating efficiencies in the use of technology in state government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Effective date 6/10/2010**. | |
2010-04-01 | Chapter 282, 2010 Laws PV. | |
2010-04-01 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-11 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-10 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-09 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-08 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. | |
2010-03-05 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-03 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-03-02 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-27 | WAYS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-27 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |