WA HB2990 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Tacoma Narrows bridge debt service payment plan.
Title
Concerning the Tacoma Narrows bridge debt service payment plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Chapter 195, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 8:00 AM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-21 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |