WA HB2988 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Effective date 4/18/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Effective date 4/18/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making expenditures from the budget stabilization account to make critical investments.
Title
Making expenditures from the budget stabilization account to make critical investments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Effective date 4/18/2016. |
2016-04-18 | House | Chapter 34, 2016 Laws 1st Special Session. |
2016-04-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2016-03-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2016-03-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-29 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-03-29 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-03-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-23 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2016-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2016-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |