WA HB2985 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Excluding certain school facilities from the inventory of educational space for determining eligibility for state assistance for common school construction.
Title
Excluding certain school facilities from the inventory of educational space for determining eligibility for state assistance for common school construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 159, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2016-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-29 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:30 AM. |
2016-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |