WA HB2970 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing an autonomous vehicle work group.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing an autonomous vehicle work group.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-22HouseChapter 180, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-22HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03HousePassed final passage; yeas, 90; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2018-03-01SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0.
2018-03-01SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-01SenateCommittee amendment
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-26SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2018-02-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2018-02-14HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-14HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-14House1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-14HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-06HouseTR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:30 AM.
2018-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-31HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback