WA HB2938 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 7/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 7/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging participation in Washington trade conventions by modifying tax provisions related to establishing substantial nexus.
Title
Encouraging participation in Washington trade conventions by modifying tax provisions related to establishing substantial nexus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Effective date 7/1/2016. |
2016-03-31 | House | Chapter 137, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | TRED - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development. |
2016-02-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-15 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-08 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |