WA HB2906 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening opportunities for the rehabilitation and reintegration of juvenile offenders.
Title
Strengthening opportunities for the rehabilitation and reintegration of juvenile offenders.
Sponsors
Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-31 | House | Chapter 136, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 82; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2016-02-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-15 | House | Floor amendment reconsidered and adopted. |
2016-02-15 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2016-02-15 | House | Held on third reading. |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-15 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-15 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-05 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 9:00 AM. |
2016-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |