WA HB2900 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning violations of traffic laws that place vulnerable roadway users at increased risk of injury and death.
Title
Concerning violations of traffic laws that place vulnerable roadway users at increased risk of injury and death.
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] |
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Gina Mosbrucker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:30 AM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |