WA HB2899 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House General Government & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House General Government & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making the unlawful possession of instruments of financial fraud a crime.
Title
Making the unlawful possession of instruments of financial fraud a crime.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to General Government & Information Technology. |
2016-02-05 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2899&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2899.pdf |