WA HB2888 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning cetacean captivity.
Title
Concerning cetacean captivity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
2016-02-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
SB6582 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.