WA HB2877 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding distribution dates for supplemental nutrition assistance program benefits.
Title
Expanding distribution dates for supplemental nutrition assistance program benefits.
Sponsors
Rep. Teri Hickel [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. David Sawyer [D] |
Rep. James Wilcox [R] | Rep. Linda Kochmar [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage without Senate Amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-29 | House | Chapter 54, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2016-03-08 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2016-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-17 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-02-03 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB6535 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.