WA HB2852 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing standards for election data and reporting.
Title
Establishing standards for election data and reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-31 | House | Chapter 134, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | GOS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2016-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-04 | House | SG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 9:00 AM. |
2016-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |