WA HB2847 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an exemption to the definition of substantial development in chapter 90.58 RCW relating to the retrofitting of existing structures to accommodate physical access by individuals with disabilities.
Title
Creating an exemption to the definition of substantial development in chapter 90.58 RCW relating to the retrofitting of existing structures to accommodate physical access by individuals with disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. JD Rossetti [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 193, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 86; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2016-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |