WA HB2843 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting affordable housing.
Title
Supporting affordable housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2016-02-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-02 | House | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |