WA HB2841 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the standard health questionnaire.
Title
Concerning the standard health questionnaire.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Bill Hinkle [R] | Rep. Daniel Kristiansen [R] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] |
Sen. Kirk Pearson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-04-01 | Chapter 277, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-04-01 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | HEA - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-18 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-29 | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-15 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |