WA HB2836 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an unpiloted aircraft system state coordinator.
Title
Establishing an unpiloted aircraft system state coordinator.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 12:00 PM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |