WA HB2831 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Assisting small businesses licensed to sell liquor in Washington state.
Title
Assisting small businesses licensed to sell liquor in Washington state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 190, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2016-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-11 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to General Government & Information Technology. |
2016-02-02 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |