WA HB2807 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Effective date 1/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Effective date 1/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning heavy haul industrial corridors.
Title
Concerning heavy haul industrial corridors.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] |
Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | House | Effective date 1/1/2017. |
2016-03-25 | House | Chapter 26, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2016-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-08 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |