WA HB2799 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain local sales and use taxes may be used for prevention and outreach programs.
Title
Providing that certain local sales and use taxes may be used for prevention and outreach programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-05 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2799&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2799.pdf |