WA HB2780 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making higher education more affordable by providing incentives for the use of open source instructional materials.
Title
Making higher education more affordable by providing incentives for the use of open source instructional materials.
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] |
Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Teri Hickel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2016-02-01 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2780&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2780.pdf |