WA HB2776 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 6/10/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 6/10/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding funding distribution formulas for K-12 education.
Title
Regarding funding distribution formulas for K-12 education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Effective date 6/10/2010*. | |
2010-03-29 | Chapter 236, 2010 Laws PV. | |
2010-03-29 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Passed final passage; yeas, 71; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-11 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-11 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2010-03-11 | Rules suspended. | |
2010-03-11 | Senate receded from amendments. | |
2010-03-11 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. | |
2010-03-11 | Senate insists on its position and asks House to concur. | |
2010-03-10 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. | |
2010-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-10 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-10 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2010-03-10 | Rules suspended. | |
2010-03-10 | Senate receded from amendments. | |
2010-03-08 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. | |
2010-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-04 | Notice given to reconsider vote on third reading. | |
2010-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-04 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-03-01 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-01 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-03-01 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-25 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-25 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-25 | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-08 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-08 | WAYS - Majority; do pass APPE 10 bill proposed by Education Appropriations. | |
2010-02-08 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-08 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-03 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-28 | APPE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-28 | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Education Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-13 | First reading, referred to Education Appropriations. |