WA HB2752 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying provisions relating to providing shelter to a minor.
Title
Modifying provisions relating to providing shelter to a minor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-26 | Chapter 229, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-26 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 91; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-04 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-16 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-15 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-29 | ELCS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | ELCS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-13 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Children's Services. |