WA HB2749 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending dates concerning measuring performance and performance-based contracting of the child welfare system.
Title
Extending dates concerning measuring performance and performance-based contracting of the child welfare system.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 184, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 91; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2016-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-09 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-02-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB6382 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.